EP1453166 - Holding element for preventing electric apparatus from being disengaged from cable channels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMELTI S.R.L. Via Rotondi 7 20037 Paderno Dugnano MI / IT | [2007/26] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states RES & DEV s.r.l. Via Rotondi, 7 20037 Paderno Dugnano (MI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villi, Piiergiorgio c/o RES & DEV S.R.L. Via Rotondi, 7 20037 Paderno Dugnano, Milano / IT | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04004188.1 | 25.02.2004 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | IT2003MI00085 | 26.02.2003 Original published format: IT MI20030085 | [2004/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1453166 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1453166 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1453166 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04, H02G3/12 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H02G3/105 (EP);
H02G3/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/36] | Title | German: | Halteelement zur Vermeidung des Herausspringens eines elektrischen Gerät aus einem Kabelkanal | [2004/36] | English: | Holding element for preventing electric apparatus from being disengaged from cable channels | [2004/36] | French: | Element de maintien pour prévenir le découplage d'un appareil électrique d'un chemin de câble | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2004 | AT | 11.05.2011 | BE | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0844714 (PLANET WATTOHM SA [FR]) [A] 1-5* figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0932233 (REHAU SA [FR]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0237633 (SPELSBERG GUENTHER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2 * |