EP1568831 - Body made of fibres with cavities containing a biocide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnet, Martin Frankfurter Strasse 93 51147 Köln / DE | 02 /
Klaar, Karlo Hannoversche Strasse 29 53839 Troisdorf / DE | 03 /
Slongo, Mario Sägetrainweg 6 1712 Tafers / CH | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Isler, Jörg c/o Sika Technology AG Intellectual Property Department Tüffenwies 16-22 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Isler, Jörg c/o Sika Technology AG Intellectual Property Department Tüffenwies 16-22 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/35] | Isler, Jörg c/o Sika Technology AG, Geschäftsstelle Zürich, Tüffenwies 16, Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04004338.2 | 26.02.2004 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568831 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/14 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
A01N25/34 (EP);
A01N43/80 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/34, A01N55/00, A01N43/80, A01N43/40, A01N33/12 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N33/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | Aus Fasern aufgebauter Körper mit Hohlräumen enthaltend ein Biozid | [2005/35] | English: | Body made of fibres with cavities containing a biocide | [2005/35] | French: | Corps constitué de fibres avec cavités contenant un biocide | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4180508 (BECKER FRANK C [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 32 - line 37 * * column 2, line 7 - line 13; example 2 * [A] 9-13; | [A]EP0047797 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 11 - line 14; claims 1,6 *; | JPH05139918 [ ] (NIKKA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [X]EP1210966 (SCHOELLER & HOESCH PAPIERFAB [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0025] , [0037]; claim 3 *; | [A] - CA, (19931002), Database accession no. 119:133450, URL: STN, XP002286676 [A] 3 * column A * |