EP1460481 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chigira, Nobutoshi c/o Oki Data Corp. 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
Chigira, Nobutoshi c/o Oki Data Corp. 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04004417.4 | 26.02.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | JP20030048501 | 26.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003048501 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1460481 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1460481 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1460481 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G03G15/5062 (EP,US);
G03G15/5058 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00037 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0119 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/42] |
Former [2007/40] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2004/39] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2004/39] | French: | Dispositif de formation d'images | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 04.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4894685 (SHOJI HISASHI [JP]) [Y] 4 * column 5, lines 10-67 * * column 7, lines 37-50; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0628887 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 5* page 8, lines 11-54 *; | [A]JPH07248659 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [XY]US5859933 (SASANUMA NOBUATSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 22 * * column 19, lines 45-50; figure 7 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]US5873010 (ENOMOTO NAOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * column 3, lines 61-65 * * column 4, lines 3-7,15-25,35-48; figure 5 *; | [A]JPH11223966 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | Examination | US6408156 |