EP1431289 - Electroluminescent iridium compounds with fluorinated phenylpyridines, phenylpyrimidines, and phenylquinolines and devices made with such compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petrov, Viacheslav A. 2 Cappa Court Hockessin DE 19707 / US | 02 /
Wang, Ying 4010 Greenmount Road Wilmington DE 19810 / US | 03 /
Grushin, Vladimir 533 Runnymeade Road Hockessin DE 19707 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04004543.7 | 27.06.2001 | Priority number, date | US20000215362P | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 215362 P | US20000224273P | 10.08.2000 Original published format: US 224273 P | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431289 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431289 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431289 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00, C09K11/06, H05B33/14, C07D213/30, C07F15/00, C07D213/61, C07D213/26, C07D213/68, C07D239/26, H01L51/30, C07D215/04 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/26 (EP,US);
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/68 (EP,US);
C07D215/04 (EP,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07F15/0033 (EP,US);
H10K85/341 (EP,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1014 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,US);
H10K50/00 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | H05B33/14, C09K11/06, C07F15/00, C07D213/61, C07D213/26, C07D213/68, C07D239/26, H01L51/30 | ||
Former IPC [2004/26] | C07D213/26, C07D213/61, C07D213/68, C07D239/26, C07F15/00, C09K11/06, H05B33/14, H01L51/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/36] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrolumineszente Iridiumverbindungen mit fluorierten Phenylpyridinen, Phenylpyridinen und Phenylchinolinen und solche Verbindungen enthaltende Vorrichtungen | [2004/26] | English: | Electroluminescent iridium compounds with fluorinated phenylpyridines, phenylpyrimidines, and phenylquinolines and devices made with such compounds | [2004/26] | French: | Composés d'iridium électroluminescents contenant des phénylpyridines fluorées, des phénylpyrimidines et des phénylquinolines et dispositifs fabriqués avec ces composés | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 25.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01950576.7 / EP1295514 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010950576) is 30.05.2003 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9603410 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1,2,20,21 *; | CN1245822 [ ] (UNIV JILIN [CN]); | [DA] - DJUROVICH PETER I ET AL, "Ir(III) CYCLOMETALATED COMPLEXES AS EFFICIENT PHOSPHORESCENT EMITTERS IN POLYMER BLEND AND ORGANIC LEDs", POLYMER PREPRINTS, (2000), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 770 - 771, XP001052648 [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - CHATANI N; IE Y; KAKIUCHI F; MURAI S, "Ru3(CO)12-Catalyzed Reaction of Pyridylbenzenes with Carbon Monoxide and Olefins. Carbonylation at a C-H Bond in the Benzene Ring", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 2604 - 2610, XP002201286 [A] 1-11 * page 2606, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo970131r | [A] - GOSMINI C; NÉDÉLEC J Y; PÉRICHON J, "Electrosynthesis of functionalized 2-arylpyridines from functionalized aryl and pyridine halides catalyzed by nickel bromide 2,2'-bipyridine complex", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2000), vol. 41, pages 5039 - 5042, XP002201287 [A] 1-11 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)00760-7 | [A] - CACCHI S; FABRIZI G; MARINELLI F, "The Palladium-Catalyzed Transfer Hdrogenation/Heterocyclization of beta-(2-Aminophenyl)-alpha,beta-ynones. An Approach to 2-Aryl- and 2-Vinylquinolines", SYNLETT, (1999), XP002201288 [A] 1-11 * scheme 1, scheme 2, table 1, compound 1e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1999-2629 | [A] - BALDO M A ET AL, "VERY HIGH-EFFICIENCY GREEN ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICES BASED ON ELECTROPHOSPHORESCENCE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19990705), vol. 75, no. 1, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 4 - 6, XP000850655 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124258 | [A] - BALDO M A ET AL, "High-efficiency fluorescent organic light-emitting devices using a phosphorescent sensitizer", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (20000217), vol. 403, no. 6771, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 750 - 753, XP002183466 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35001541 | [A] - WANG, YUE ET AL, "(Hydroxyphenyl)pyridine derivative, its metal complexes and application a electroluminescence material", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 133:315395, URL: STN, XP002201289 [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - DEDEIAN ET AL, "A NEW SYNTHETIC ROUTE TO THE PREPARATION OF A SERIES OF STRONG PHOTOREDUCING AGENTS: FAC TRIS-ORTHO-METALATED COMPLEXES OF IRIDIUM (III) WITH SUBSTITUTED 2-PHENYLPYRIDINES", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, US, (1991), vol. 30, no. 30, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 1685 - 1687, XP001070331 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic00008a003 | by applicant | EP0443861 | US5247190 | US5408109 | US5552678 | - APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1999), vol. 75, page 4 | - POLYMER PREPRINTS, (2000), vol. 41, no. 1, page 770 | - O. LOHSE; P.THEVENIN; E. WALDVOGEL, SYNLETT, (1999), pages 45 - 48 | - MARKUS; JOHN, Electronics and Nucleonics Dictionary, MCGRAW-HILL, INC., (1966), page 470,476 | - "Flexible light-emitting diodes made from soluble conducting polymer", NATURE, (19920611), vol. 357, pages 477 - 479 | - Y. WANG, Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, (1996), vol. 18, pages 837 - 860 |