EP1466601 - Prevention of migraine recurrence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For:GB
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
NL
PT
SE
PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Neville Colin of Pfizer Global Research &Devel. Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 02 /
Uden, Stephen Pfizer Global Res.&Devel. MS 6025-B2000A Eastern Point Road Groton Connecticut 06340 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Motion, Keith Robert, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Motion, Keith Robert, et al Pfizer Limited, European Pharma Patent Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04004643.5 | 14.06.1999 | Priority number, date | GB19980016556 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9816556 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1466601 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1466601 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/403, A61P25/06 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/404 (EP,KR);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/403 (EP);
A61K31/4045 (EP);
A61K31/41 (EP);
A61K31/4196 (EP);
A61K31/42 (EP);
A61K31/422 (EP);
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/454 (EP);
A61K31/52 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/52, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | 01.03.2004 | LT | 01.03.2004 | LV | 01.03.2004 | MK | 01.03.2004 | RO | 01.03.2004 | SI | 01.03.2004 | Title | German: | Vorbeugung des Wiederauftretens der Migräne | [2004/42] | English: | Prevention of migraine recurrence | [2004/42] | French: | Prévention des migraines recurrentes | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/06] | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99922459.5 / EP1100499 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0546593 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, lines 43-45 * * page 5, lines 12-20 * * page 5, lines 50,51 * * page 6, lines 28-40 * * page 6, lines 53-57 * * page 7, lines 1-4 * * examples 1-15; claims 1-13 *; | [Y]US5464633 (CONTE UBALDO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9802186 (FARMARC NEDERLAND BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 9 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 5 - page 11, paragraph 4 * * examples 1-4; claims 1,3,13,15,16 * [Y] 2,3,5-15; | [PX]WO9901135 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1,4,15* the whole document *; | [XY] - MILLSON D, "DO WE NEED ANOTHER TRIPTAN FOR THE ACUTE TREATMENT OF MIGRAINE HEADACHE?", EOS, SIGMA-TAU, ROME, IT, (1998), vol. 18, no. 3/4, ISSN 0392-6699, pages 99 - 104, XP000853891 [X] 1,4,15 * table 1 * [Y] 2,3,5-14 |