EP1455089 - Variable displacement compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarutani, Tomoji, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ota, Masaki, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawamura, Hisato, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Yoshinori, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Kawaguchi, Masahiro, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Vollnhals, Aurel Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner (GbR), TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04004867.0 | 02.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | JP20030056112 | 03.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003056112 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455089 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/10 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
F04B27/1063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/21] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Variabler Verdrängungskompressor | [2004/37] | English: | Variable displacement compressor | [2004/37] | French: | Compresseur à déplacement variable | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/48] | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1146228 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, paragraph 30 - paragraph 32 *; | [A]EP1150012 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 1,2* abstract * |