EP1489629 - Superconducting cable and superconducting cable line using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, Ltd 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujikami, Jun Osaka Works Sumitomo Elec.Ind, Ltd 1-1-3 Shimaya Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Kreutzer, Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005248.2 | 05.03.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | JP20030174657 | 19.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003174657 | JP20030428296 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003428296 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1489629 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1489629 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01B12/02, H02G15/34 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
H01B12/02 (EP,US);
E04H12/2292 (KR);
C09D5/22 (KR);
F21S8/085 (KR);
F21V21/116 (KR);
H01R4/68 (EP,US);
H02G15/34 (EP,US);
F21W2131/103 (KR);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/52] | H01B12/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, IT [2006/39] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Supraleitendes Kabel und damit ausgerüstete supraleitende Kabelleitung. | [2004/52] | English: | Superconducting cable and superconducting cable line using the same | [2004/52] | French: | Câble supraconducteur et ligne de câble supraconducteur l'utilisant. | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 26.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03255981 ; | [A]EP0780926 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT]); | [A]US6153825 (ANDO TOSHINARI [JP], et al); | [A]AU739105B (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP) |