EP1570804 - Method to manufacture a dental device using injection molding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/36] | Dental device and method to manufacture the same using injection molding | ||
[2007/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Straumann Holding AG Hauptstrasse 26d 4437 Waldenburg / CH | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solèr, Christoph Grienweg 14 4222 Zwingen / CH | 02 /
Mundwiler, Ulrich Hofmattweg 22 4456 Tenniken BL / CH | 03 /
Wieland, Marco, Dr. In den Ziegelhöfen 22 4054 Basel BS / CH | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005302.7 | 05.03.2004 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570804 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570804 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
A61C8/0012 (EP,US);
A61C8/0063 (EP,US);
B28B1/24 (EP,US);
A61C2008/0046 (EP,US);
A61C8/0048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer zahnärztlichen Vorrichtung mit Spritzguss | [2007/12] | English: | Method to manufacture a dental device using injection molding | [2007/12] | French: | Méthode de manufacture d'un objet dentaire via moulage par injection | [2007/12] |
Former [2005/36] | Zahnärztliche Vorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren mit Spritzguss | ||
Former [2005/36] | Dental device and method to manufacture the same using injection molding | ||
Former [2005/36] | Objet dentaire et méthode de manufacture via moulage par injection | Examination procedure | 23.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.10.2007 | BE | 03.10.2007 | CY | 03.10.2007 | CZ | 03.10.2007 | DK | 03.10.2007 | EE | 03.10.2007 | FI | 03.10.2007 | NL | 03.10.2007 | PL | 03.10.2007 | RO | 03.10.2007 | SI | 03.10.2007 | SK | 03.10.2007 | TR | 03.10.2007 | BG | 03.01.2008 | SE | 03.01.2008 | GR | 04.01.2008 | ES | 14.01.2008 | PT | 03.03.2008 | IE | 05.03.2008 | LU | 05.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | HU | 04.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CY | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
TR | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
HU | 04.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CY | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
HU | 04.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CY | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LU | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CY | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
FI | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CY | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SI | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
EE | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
GR | 04.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
BE | 03.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
RO | 03.10.2007 | ||
SK | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
CZ | 03.10.2007 | ||
DK | 03.10.2007 | ||
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 03.10.2007 | |
NL | 03.10.2007 | ||
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 03.10.2007 | |
PL | 03.10.2007 | ||
BG | 03.01.2008 | ||
SE | 03.01.2008 | ||
ES | 14.01.2008 | ||
PT | 03.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5052931 (KIRSCH AXEL DR [DE]) [A] 2-4,9,15,16 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 12 * * column 3, line 42 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0538073 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5482671 (WEBER WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 10,11,13,14,17,18 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO9738811 (APV UK PLC [GB], et al) [X] 10,11,13-18 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 15; claims 27-29 *; | [A]EP0820737 (INJEX CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,10* page 2, line 10 - line 46 *; | [A]US6419491 (RICCI JOHN [US], et al) [A] 6,21 * column 1, line 36 - line 51 * * column 2, line 41 - line 54 *; | [X]US2002160334 (BRODBECK URS [CH]) [X] 1,5,7 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0041] *; | [X]US2004038180 (MAYER JORG [CH], et al) [X] 1,7,10,18 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0034] * |