EP1465327 - Vibration-powered and in a substrate integrated generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/19] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schindler, Günther Ungererstrasse 19 80802 München / DE | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005329.0 | 05.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | DE2003110161 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10310161 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465327 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1465327 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1465327 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K35/02 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
H02K35/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/27] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vibrationsbetriebener und in ein Substrat integrierter Generator | [2004/41] | English: | Vibration-powered and in a substrate integrated generator | [2004/41] | French: | Generateur à l'energie vibratoire et integré dans une substrat | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA] - LI W J ET AL, "Infrared signal transmission by a laser-micromachined vibration-induced power generator", PROCEEDINGS 43RD IEEE MIDWEST SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (20000808), vol. 1, pages 236 - 239, XP010558118 [Y] 1,3,5,7-10,17,19 * page 236, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 238, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 239, column 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,6 * [A] 1,3,17,19 | [Y] - MENINGER S ET AL, "Vibration-to-electric energy conversion", PROCEEDINGS 1999 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LOW POWER ELECTRONICS AND DESIGN. (ISLPED). SAN DIEGO, CA, AUG. 16 - 17, 1999, INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON LOW POWER ELECTRONICS AND DESIGN, NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19990816), ISBN 1-58113-133-X, pages 48 - 53, XP010355950 [Y] 1-3,5,7-10,13,15-19 * page 49, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 2; figures 1,4,5,13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/313817.313840 | [Y] - WAGNER B ET AL, "Microfabricated actuator with moving permanent magnet", PROCEEDINGS OF THE WORKSHOP ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS. INVESTIGATION OF MICRO STRUCTURES, SENSORS, ACTUATORS, MACHINES AND ROBOTS. NARA, JP., JAN. 30 - FEB. 2, 1991, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910130), vol. WORKSHOP 4, ISBN 0-87942-641-1, pages 27 - 32, XP010039601 [Y] 2,13,16-18 * page 31, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 1,4,5 * * page 27, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 28, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.1991.114764 | [DYA] - WILLIAMS C B ET AL, "Development of an electromagnetic micro-generator", IEE PROCEEDINGS: CIRCUITS DEVICES AND SYSTEMS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STENVENAGE, GB, (20011205), vol. 148, no. 6, ISSN 1350-2409, pages 337 - 342, XP006017626 [DY] 15 * page 338, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 339, column 2, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * page 342, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 5,7,8 * [A] 1,15-17,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-cds:20010525 | [A] - T.M.LIAKOPOULOS, W. ZHANG, C.H.AHN, "Micromashined thick permanent magnet arrays on silicon wafers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, (199609), no. 5, pages 5154 - 5156, XP002292024 [A] 1-20 * page 5154, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 5155, column 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.539521 |