EP1459825 - Cutter for bolts or rods, particularly screwed rods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REMS-WERK Christian Föll und Söhne GmbH & Co Stuttgarter Strasse 83 71332 Waiblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states REMS-WERK Christian Föll und Söhne GmbH & Co Stuttgarter Strasse 83 71332 Waiblingen / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states REMS-WERK Christian Föll und Söhne GmbH & Co Stuttgarter Strasse 83 71332 Waiblingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Rudolf Dr.-Ing. Mannheimer Strasse 3 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005373.8 | 06.03.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | DE2003113827 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10313827 | [2004/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1459825 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1459825 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23D29/00, B23D29/02, B25B7/00, B25B7/02 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
B23D17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2005/23] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Trennvorrichtung für Werkstücke, wie Stangen, Bolzen und dergleichen, insbesondere für Gewindestangen | [2004/39] | English: | Cutter for bolts or rods, particularly screwed rods | [2004/39] | French: | Outil pour couper les boulons ou les tiges, notamment les tiges filetées | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2011/32] |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 24.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS63127810 ; | [X]GB444927 (C & J HAMTTON LTD, et al) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE1705779U (BIERMANN KARL [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US3181181 (BUCKLEY JOHN Z, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4249308 (BOYAJIAN ALFRED Z [US]) [X] 1,4-6,9-11 * the whole document * [Y] 3,7; | [X]FR2529813 (KRENN WERKZEUGFAB [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-11* the whole document *; | [XY]DE19515955 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-10 * abstract * [Y] 3,7 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881007), vol. 0123, no. 76, Database accession no. (M - 750), & JP63127810 A 19880531 (HITACHI KOKI CO LTD) [X] 1,3-10 * abstract * [Y] 3,7 |