EP1570752 - Verwendung von ungesättigten Fettsäuren zur Verringerung des Appetits oder der Essensaufnahme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, Doris Am Ellerforst 43 DE-40627 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Zink, Ralf Nelly-Sachs-Str. 3 DE-40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
Weiss, Albrecht Forellenweg 37 DE-40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2005/36] | Application number, filing date | 04005383.7 | 06.03.2004 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570752 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570752 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K31/201 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/201 (EP,US);
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/201, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | Use of unsaturated fatty acids for the reduction of appetite or food intake | [2005/36] | English: | Verwendung von ungesättigten Fettsäuren zur Verringerung des Appetits oder der Essensaufnahme | [2005/36] | French: | Utilisation des acides gras insaturés pour la diminution de l'appétit ou de l'apport alimentaire | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2009
26.06.2009
ADMISSIBLE Loders Croklaan Nutrition B.V. Hogeweg 1 1521 A Z Wormerveer / NL Opponent's representative Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2009
26.06.2009
ADMISSIBLE Loders Croklaan Nutrition B.V. Hogeweg 1 1521 A Z Wormerveer / NL Opponent's representative Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2009/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.2009
Lipid Nutrition B.V. Hogeweg 1 1521 AZ Wormerveer / NL Opponent's representative Stevens, Ian Edward Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | 01.07.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2011 | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.10.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/08] | 03.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.2008 | BE | 02.07.2008 | CY | 02.07.2008 | CZ | 02.07.2008 | DK | 02.07.2008 | EE | 02.07.2008 | FI | 02.07.2008 | PL | 02.07.2008 | RO | 02.07.2008 | SI | 02.07.2008 | SK | 02.07.2008 | TR | 02.07.2008 | BG | 02.10.2008 | SE | 02.10.2008 | GR | 03.10.2008 | PT | 02.12.2008 | HU | 03.01.2009 | IE | 06.03.2009 | LU | 06.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | NL | 01.10.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
HU | 03.01.2009 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
LU | 06.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
LU | 06.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
NL | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
IE | 06.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
BE | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 02.07.2008 | |
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002082436 (JEROME DARIA [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraphs 12,13 *; | [X] - KAMPHUIS M M J W ET AL, "Effect of conjugated linoleic acid supplementation after weight loss on appetite and food intake in overweight subjects.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION. OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 57, no. 10, ISSN 0954-3007, pages 1268 - 1274, XP008032316 [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 1269, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1269, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 1271 - page 1272; figures 2-4 * * page 1272, column 2, paragraphs 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ejcn.1601684 | [A] - MEDINA EDWARD A ET AL, "Conjugated linoleic acid supplementation in humans: Effects on circulating leptin concentrations and appetite", LIPIDS, (200007), vol. 35, no. 7, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 783 - 788, XP008032315 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-000-0586-y | [AD] - MOYA-CAMARENA SILVIA Y ET AL, "Conjugated linoleic acid is a potent naturally occurring ligand and activator of PPARalpha", JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (199908), vol. 40, no. 8, ISSN 0022-2275, pages 1426 - 1433, XP001196994 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * |