EP1574502 - Use of pyrimidine compounds in the preparation of parasiticides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | Representative(s) | Gros, Florent, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Gros, Florent, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 04005423.1 | 08.03.2004 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574502 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/46, C07D239/60, C07D239/50 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C07D239/46 (EP,US);
A61P33/14 (EP);
C07D239/50 (EP,US);
C07D239/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung von Pyrimidinverbindungen zur Herstellung von Parasitiziden | [2005/37] | English: | Use of pyrimidine compounds in the preparation of parasiticides | [2005/37] | French: | Utilisation de composés pyrimidine pour la préparation d'agents parasiticides | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) | 06.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0650482 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 3 * * page 1, formula (I) * * page 5, line 12 - line 13 *; | [X]WO9402470 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 1, formula (I) * * page 7, line 28 * * page 8, line 17 *; | [DX]US6342499 (BLACK BRUCE CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * column 1, line 11 - line 17 * * column 1, line 45 - line 55 ** column 2, formula (I) * |