EP1447398 - Retroviral protease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michael. Clare 5154 West Brown Street Skokie, IL 60077 / US | 02 /
Decrescenzo, Gary Antony 536 Schrader Farm Drive St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 03 /
Freskos, John Nicholas 7572 York Clayton, MO 63105 / US | 04 /
Getman, Daniel Paul 66 Sunny Hill Court Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 05 /
Heintz, Robert Martin 603 Nancy Palace Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | 06 /
Lin, Ko-Chung 345 Vassar Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 07 /
Mueller, Richard August 562 Stonegate Terrace Glencoe, IL 60022 / US | 08 /
Reed, Kathryn Lea 7301-104 Brookmont Drive Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 09 /
Rogier, Donald Joseph Jr. 15821-A-Timbervalley Road Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 10 /
Talley, John Jeffrey 1079 Darwick Court St. Luis, MO 63132 / US | 11 /
Vazquez, Michael Lawrence 614 Castle Meadows Court Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | [2005/16] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
Michael. Clare 5154 West Brown Street Skokie, IL 60077 / US | ||
02 /
Decrescenzo, Gary Antony 536 Schrader Farm Drive St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | |||
03 /
Freskos, John Nicholas 7572 York Clayton, MO 63105 / US | |||
04 /
Getman, Daniel Paul 66 Sunny Hill Court Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | |||
05 /
Heintz, Robert Martin 603 Nancy Palace Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | |||
06 /
Lin, Ko-Chung 345 Vassar Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
07 /
Mueller, Richard August 562 Stonegate Terrace Glencoe, IL 60022 / US | |||
08 /
Reed, Kathryn Lea 7301-104 Brookmont Drive Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | |||
09 /
Rogier, Donald Joseph Jr. 2346 Halfmoon Drive, Appartment 1 St. Louis, MO 63114 / US | |||
10 /
Talley, John Jeffrey 1079 Darwick Court St. Luis, MO 63132 / US | |||
11 /
Vazquez, Michael Lawrence 233 Saratoga Court Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Strych, Werner, et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005829.9 | 04.05.1993 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | US19920886700 | 21.05.1992 Original published format: US 886700 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447398 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/16, C07D211/60, C07D217/26, C07D401/12, A61K31/47 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/60 (EP,US);
C07D217/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2005/19] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Inhibitoren von Retroviraler Protease | [2004/34] | English: | Retroviral protease inhibitors | [2004/34] | French: | Inhibiteurs de protéase rétrovirale | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 12.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01118721.8 / EP1148050 | EP93911046.6 / EP0641325 | EP99113622.7 / EP0957093 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0346847 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DY] 1-49 * claim - *; | [Y]WO9108221 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al) [Y] 1-49* page 2, line 13 - line 16; figures 3,5; claim - *; | [Y]EP0432695 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-49 * claim - *; | [Y]EP0472077 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-49 * page 17, line 11 - page 18, line 27; claim - * |