EP1480323 - Electrostatic actuator and method of its displacement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gondoh, Masahiko Olympus Corporation 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005853.9 | 11.03.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | JP20030090061 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003090061 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480323 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02N1/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H02N1/004 (EP,US);
H02K2201/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/33] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrostatischer Aktuator und Verfahren zum Bewegen desselbens | [2004/48] | English: | Electrostatic actuator and method of its displacement | [2004/48] | French: | Actionneur électrostatique et procédé de son déplacement | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB500161 (RESEARCH CORP) [Y] 1-12,14-16 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 123; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]DD293013 (GUENTER DREIFKE [DE]) [Y] 1-9,15-17,19 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]US5239222 (HIGUCHI TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,15,17,19* column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 39; figures 1,2,3a-3t,4,5,7 *; | [XY]EP1193853 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,15,17-19 * column 9, paragraph 19 - column 12, paragraph 35; figures 1,2,3a-3c * [Y] 1-12,14-16; | [XY]EP1202099 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,15,17-19 * column 15, line 13 - column 17, line 4; figures 1a,2,3a-3f,9,18-20 * [Y] 1-9,15-17,19 |