EP1460645 - Dielectric porcelain composition and dielectric resonator using the composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2007/30] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuhara Miyauchi 1-13-1, Nihonbashi,Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Tomohiro Arashi 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Seemann, Ralph Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005983.4 | 12.03.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | JP20030071545 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003071545 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1460645 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1460645 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1460645 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/02, H01B3/12 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
H01P7/10 (EP,US);
H02K7/106 (KR);
C04B35/20 (EP,US);
C04B35/465 (EP,US);
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
H01B3/12 (EP,US);
H02K5/24 (KR);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3236 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Title | German: | Dielektrische Porzellan-Zusammensetzung und dielektrischer Resonator | [2004/39] | English: | Dielectric porcelain composition and dielectric resonator using the composition | [2004/39] | French: | Composition diélectrique et résonateur diélectrique | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2007 | BE | 25.07.2007 | CH | 25.07.2007 | CY | 25.07.2007 | CZ | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | EE | 25.07.2007 | LI | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | PL | 25.07.2007 | RO | 25.07.2007 | SI | 25.07.2007 | SK | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | BG | 25.10.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | HU | 26.01.2008 | IE | 12.03.2008 | LU | 12.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
TR | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
HU | 26.01.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LU | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
HU | 26.01.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LU | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LU | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SI | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
EE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
RO | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SK | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
PL | 25.07.2007 | ||
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
BG | 25.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 05.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002193662 ; | [X]JP8208330 ; | [X]JP6056519 ; | [X]US4242213 (KATSUBE MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-15 * column 1, line 9 - line 47; claim 1; table 2 *; | [X]EP0727789 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,9-15 * claims 1-10; tables 1-5 *; | [X]US5683790 (SUZUKI KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,10,13 * column 6, line 8 - line 17; claims 1-12; tables 1-3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021106), vol. 2002, no. 11, & JP2002193662 A 20020710 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-3,10,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP8208330 A 19960813 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1,3-7,9-15 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940602), vol. 0182, no. 88, Database accession no. (C - 1207), & JP6056519 A 19940301 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO LTD) [X] 1,3-7,9-15 * abstract * |