EP1463155 - Connector in which a locking portion to be engaged with a housing is formed inside a contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY LIMITED 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/08] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY LIMITED 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasebe, Kiyoharu Japan Aviation Elec. Ind., Limited 21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Hofer, Dorothea, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04006008.9 | 12.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030070154 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003070154 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463155 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463155 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/115, H01R13/422, H01R13/436, H01R13/187 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H01R13/113 (EP,US);
H01R13/187 (EP,US);
H01R13/4223 (EP,US);
H01R13/4364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbinder, in welchem ein mit dem Gehäuse greifendes Verriegelungselement an einen Kontakt angeordnet ist | [2004/40] | English: | Connector in which a locking portion to be engaged with a housing is formed inside a contact | [2004/40] | French: | Connecteur dans lequel un élément de blocage destiné à coopérer avec le boitier est formé sur un contact | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.02.2006 | SE | 13.03.2006 | DE | 03.10.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | SE | 13.03.2006 | |
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
DE | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | SE | 13.03.2006 | |
DE | 03.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2721758 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [A] 1,3,11 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 21 * * figures 1,4,7 *; | [A]US5558547 (BREITSCHAFT JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,11 * column 4, lines 35-52 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5860836 (OHNO AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-6,10,11 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 11 * * figures 4d,8 *; | [A]US5897405 (ENDO HIROSHI [US]) [A] 1,3,7-9,11 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 46 * * figure - *; | [A]EP1271702 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,3,11* figure 7 *; | [A]EP1289071 (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0036] * * figure - *; | [A] - "FCI MINIATURISE SON SICMA", INGENIEURS DE L'AUTOMOBILE, RAIP. BOULOGNE, FR, (1996), no. 702, ISSN 0020-1200, page 18, XP000555838 [A] 1,3,11 * figure - * |