EP1479494 - Edge-banding apparatus for a program controlled machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMA Klessmann GmbH Holzbearbeitungssysteme Industriestrasse 3 32312 Lübbecke / DE | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rose, Martin Ing. (grad.) Heuerhofstrasse 8 32339 Espelkamp / DE | 02 /
Schürmann, Michael Horstlandstrasse 2 32257 Bünde / DE | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Schober, Mirko, et al Thielking & Elbertzhagen Patentanwälte Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Schober, Mirko, et al Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Elbertzhagen, Otto, Dipl.-Ing., Patentanwalt Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 04006305.9 | 17.03.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | DE20031023266 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10323266 | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479494 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1479494 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479494 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B27D5/00, B27G5/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B27G5/00 (EP);
B27D5/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2008/45] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kantenanleimaggregat für eine programmgesteuerte Maschine | [2004/48] | English: | Edge-banding apparatus for a program controlled machine | [2004/48] | French: | Encolleuse de chants pour une machine commandée par programme | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.08.2010 | [2010/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]DE8701376U (IMA-NORTE MASCHINENFABRIKEN KLESSMANN GMBH & CO, 4830 GUETERSLOH, DE) [A] 1 * the whole document *[Y] 3; | [XY]DE19741163 (HOMAG MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-16 * * column 5, line 32 - line 37 * * column 8, line 24 - line 56 * * column 9, line 35 - column 11, line 22 * * figure - * [Y] 3 | Examination | DE10124695 | by applicant | DE8701376U | DE19741163 | DE10124695 |