EP1486511 - Refolding of polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Builder, Stuart 2827 Weberly Drive Belmont CA 94002 / US | 02 /
Lester, Phillip 15766 Via Colusa San Lorenzo CA 94580 / US | 03 /
Hart, Roger 1060 Carolan Avenue 115 Burlingame CA 94010 / US | 04 /
Reifsnyder, David 17 Murray Court San Mateo CA 94403 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04006513.8 | 15.08.1994 | [2004/51] | Priority number, date | US19930110664 | 20.08.1993 Original published format: US 110664 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486511 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486511 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/65 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
C07K1/1133 (EP,US);
C07K14/61 (EP,US);
C07K14/65 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/51] | Title | German: | Faltung von Polypeptiden | [2004/51] | English: | Refolding of polypeptides | [2004/51] | French: | Repliement de polypeptides | [2004/51] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94927917.8 / EP0714406 | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2008/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0302469 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0312358 (PITMAN MOORE INC [US]) [A] 1 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]WO9100344 (UNIV DUNDEE [GB]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 3 - line 9 *; | [Y]WO9311240 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * page 7, line 21 - line 25; example -; claim - *; | [PA]WO9319084 (SYNERGEN INC [US]) [PA] 1-14 * page 9, line 12 - line 17; example -; claim - *; | [Y] - T.E. CREIGHTON, Disulfide bond formation in Proteins, in: Methods in Enzymology, Vol 107, pages 305-329, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., (1984), XP008036777 [Y] 1-14 * page 307, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(84)07021-X | [PA] - R. HERMANN, Protein folding, RIJSWIJK (ZH), THE NETHERLANDS, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, (1993), ISBN 90-9006173-8, XP002300790 [PA] 1 * page 13 * |