EP1460544 - Method of maintaining a plurality of snapshots, server apparatus and storage apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Takahiro, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Sonoda, Koji, Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Eguchi, Yoshiaki, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Horiuchi, Takashi, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Hirezaki, Katsumi, Hitachi, Ltd., Int. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2004/39] | Application number, filing date | 04006577.3 | 18.03.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | JP20030073101 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003073101 | JP20030168589 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003168589 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1460544 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1460544 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G06F11/1448 (EP,US);
G06F16/10 (EP,US);
G06F11/1464 (EP,US);
G06F2201/84 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99954 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/34] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufrechterhalten einer Mehrzahl von Schnappschüssen, Servervorrichtung und Speichergerät | [2004/39] | English: | Method of maintaining a plurality of snapshots, server apparatus and storage apparatus | [2004/39] | French: | Méthode pour maintenir des images instantanées des données, dispositif serveur et dispositif de stockage de données | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 28.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5963962 (HITZ DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract ** column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 36 *; | [X]US6341341 (GRUMMON JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 6,13 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 67 * * column 4, line 29 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 35 - column 5, line 54 * * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 63; figures 2,3 * |