EP1462277 - Tyre with colored pattern and manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. 10-12, route Louis-Braille CH-1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paturle, Antoine 1, place Croix Blanche 63430 Pont du Chateau / FR | 02 /
Delbet, Cédric 12, rue Jean Bonnefons 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
Paturle, Antoine 28, Hameau des Hautes Roches 63830 Durtol / FR | ||
02 /
Delbet, Cédric 12, rue Jean Bonnefons 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Representative(s) | Diernaz, Christian Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Diernaz, Christian M. F. P. Michelin, 23, place des Carmes Dechaux, SGD/LG/PI-F35-Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04006652.4 | 19.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | FR20030003907 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0303907 | [2004/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462277 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462277 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60C13/00, B60C11/00, B29C33/42, B29C59/02, B81B1/00, B30B15/06 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B60C13/001 (EP,US);
B29C37/0053 (EP,US);
B60C11/00 (EP,US);
B29C2059/023 (EP,US);
B29D2030/726 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0055 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Reifen mit farbigem Muster und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2004/40] | English: | Tyre with colored pattern and manufacturing method | [2004/40] | French: | Pneumatique comprenant un motif coloré et procédé d'obtention | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 25.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2008 | CY | 24.09.2008 | CZ | 24.09.2008 | DK | 24.09.2008 | EE | 24.09.2008 | FI | 24.09.2008 | IE | 24.09.2008 | NL | 24.09.2008 | PL | 24.09.2008 | RO | 24.09.2008 | SI | 24.09.2008 | SK | 24.09.2008 | TR | 24.09.2008 | BG | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | GR | 25.12.2008 | ES | 04.01.2009 | PT | 24.02.2009 | GB | 19.03.2009 | LU | 19.03.2009 | HU | 25.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
GB | 19.03.2009 | ||
LU | 19.03.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
GB | 19.03.2009 | ||
LU | 19.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
GB | 19.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
GB | 19.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IE | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000153675 ; | [A]US4444713 (EGAN WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 38; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2002029814 (UNGER MARC [US], et al) [A] 8 * page 22, column L, paragraph 351 - paragraph 352; figure 40 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000153675 A 20000606 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 8 * abstract * |