EP1462796 - Gas sensor and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Käding, Stefan, Dr. Dorfstrasse 47 17309 Zerrenthin / DE | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/14] |
Former [2004/40] | Bedenbecker, Markus Untertaxetweg 88 82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 04006679.7 | 19.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | DE2003113064 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10313064 | [2004/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462796 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462796 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
G01N27/4077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/42] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gassensor und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gassensors | [2004/40] | English: | Gas sensor and method for its production | [2004/40] | French: | Capteur de gaz et méthode pour sa production | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/18] | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.09.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4272350 (CROSET MICHEL, et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-14,17,18 * figure 10 * * column 4, line 50 - line 67 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 3 * * column 6, line 43 - line 60 *; | [X]US4345985 (TOHDA MASAYUKI, et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,12-14,16-18 * column 1, line 8 - line 20 * * column 2, line 51 - line 61 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 3 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 6 * * column 8, line 61 - line 67 *; | [X]DE4305930 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,13-18 * page 3, line 30 - line 33 * * page 4, line 22 - line 25 * * page 4, line 35 - line 40 * * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2316178 (AEA TECHNOLOGY PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,6-9* the whole document *; | [XY]US5827415 (GUER TURGUT MEHMET [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-18 * column 1, lines 8-10; figures 3,4 * * column 3, line 39 - line 45 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 48 * * column 6, line 20 - line 64 * [Y] 10,19; | [Y]DE19818474 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 10,19 * column 1, line 3 - line 4 * * column 2, line 50 - line 58 * * column 4, line 46 - line 48 * * figure 2 * |