EP1578001 - Electric motor with magnet shells fixed to the inner circumference of the motor casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drexlmaier, Thomas Martin-Luther-Strasse 5 97072 Würzburg / DE | [2005/38] | Application number, filing date | 04006709.2 | 19.03.2004 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578001 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/17, H02K1/18 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H02K1/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/23] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromotor mit am Innenumfang des Motorgehäuses fixierten Magnetschalen | [2005/38] | English: | Electric motor with magnet shells fixed to the inner circumference of the motor casing | [2005/38] | French: | Moteur électrique avec coquilles d'aimant fixées dans la circumférence interieure d'un corps de moteur | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.05.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09168245 ; | [X]US3091713 (EDWARD LATTA) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 9; figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]DE19611162 (TEMIC AUTO ELECTR MOTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 4 - line 16; figures 1,3 *; | [X]DE19918521 (BUHLER MOTOR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 26; figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE10034011 (TEMIC AUTO ELECTR MOTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09168245 A 19970624 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |