EP1579831 - An absorbent article comprising edge barriers comprising a liquid absorbent thermoplastic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toro, Carlo Via Aleramo, 7 65012 Cepagatti (Pescara) / IT | 02 /
Digiacomantonio, Marco Via di Sotto, 7/2 65100 Pescara / IT | 03 /
Pompei, Enzo Strada Colle Renazzo, 166 65132 Pescara / IT | 04 /
Salone, Fiorello Via S. Eufemia a Maiella, 41 65100 Pescara / IT | 05 /
Carlucci, Giovanni Via Fieramosca, 118 66100 Chieti / IT | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2012/22] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2011/50] | Briatore, Andrea, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128-130 66020 Sambuceto di S. Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | ||
Former [2009/40] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130 66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | ||
Former [2005/39] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 128/130 66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | Application number, filing date | 04006923.9 | 23.03.2004 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579831 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61F13/4755 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/475 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Absorbierender Artikel mit Seitenbarriere, die eine flüssigkeitsabsorbierende thermoplastische Zusammensetzung enthält | [2005/39] | English: | An absorbent article comprising edge barriers comprising a liquid absorbent thermoplastic composition | [2005/39] | French: | Article absorbant avec barrières laterales comprenant une composition thermoplastique susceptible d'absorber les liquides | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 18.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4718898 (PULETTI PAUL P [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,6,9,11 * figure 1A * * column 1, line 8 - line 17 * * column 1, line 39 - line 46 * * column 2, line 17 - line 45 * * column 2, line 60 - line 66 * * column 4, line 26 - line 32 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 47 - line 54 *; | [X]WO9734557 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * figures 2,3 * * page 1 * * page 13 - page 14 * * page 32 *; | [X]US6015608 (KOSLOW EVAN E [US]) [X] 1,3,5,9,11 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 8 * * column 2, line 4 - line 9 * * column 2, line 29 - line 49 *; | [DX]EP1013291 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [DX] 1,2,5,11 * figures 11,12 * * page 1, line 17 - line 25 * * page 1, line 42 - line 54 * * page 2, line 43 - line 46 * * page 4, line 53 - line 58 * * page 5, line 10 - line 32 *; | [X]US6403857 (GROSS JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,11 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 11 - line 17 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 34 - line 41 *; | [DA]US6534572 (AHMED SHARF U [US], et al) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO03049777 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03053314 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 2 * * page 2 * * page 5 * * page 9 * * page 13 *; | [E]US2004127883 (COWELL CHRISTINE M [US], et al) [E] 1-11* the whole document * |