EP1467379 - Semiconductor memory device capable of accessing all memory cells with relative addressing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/42] | Semiconductor memory device capable of accessing all memory cells | ||
[2011/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hong-Beom Na-103 Cheongwa Apt. 291 Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Nam, Kyu-Young 104-101 Supsok Green ville 1-80 Yubang-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Hee-Jun 103-104 Sinmiju Apt. 201-2 Byeongjeom-ri Taean-eup Hwaseong-gun Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2012/19] |
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
Kim, Hong-Beom Na-103 Cheongwa Apt. 291 Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Nam, Kyu-Young 104-101 Supsok Green ville 1-80 Yubang-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Lee, Hee-Jun 103-104 Sinmiju Apt. 201-2 Byeongjeom-ri Taean-eup Hwaseong-gun Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | KUHNEN & WACKER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007099.7 | 24.03.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | KR20030022844 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: KR 2003022844 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467379 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467379 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/56, G11C29/18 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
G11C29/18 (EP,US);
G11C8/00 (KR);
G11C29/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | G11C29/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicher der mit relativer Adressierung auf alle Speicherzellen zugreifen kann | [2011/43] | English: | Semiconductor memory device capable of accessing all memory cells with relative addressing | [2011/43] | French: | Mémoire à semiconducteur avec accès à toutes les cellules mémoire com adressage relatif | [2011/43] |
Former [2004/42] | Halbleiterspeicher der auf alle Speicherzellen zugreifen kann | ||
Former [2004/42] | Semiconductor memory device capable of accessing all memory cells | ||
Former [2004/42] | Mémoire à semiconducteur avec accès à toutes les cellules mémoire | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 12.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.05.2012 | [2013/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5422892 (HII FRANCIS [MY], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 1 - line 25 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US5682472 (BREHM JEFFREY A [US], et al) [A] 1,9* abstract *; | [A]US6298429 (SCOTT ANNE P [US], et al) [A] 21 * column 3, line 22, paragraph 62; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2002170012 (ERNST WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 9,21 * paragraphs [0010] - [0022]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6499121 (ROY RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 5; figures 2-5 * |