EP1465285 - Coaxial line with forced cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spinner GmbH Erzgiessereistrasse 33 80335 München / DE | [2005/52] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Spinner GmbH Elektrotechnische Fabrik Erzgiessereistrasse 33 80335 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pitschi, Franz, Dr. Ing. Risserkogelstrasse 2 83700 Rottach-Egern / DE | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Prietsch, Reiner Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Prietsch, Reiner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Schäufeleinstrasse 7 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007218.3 | 25.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | DE2003115021 | 02.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10315021 | DE2003122482 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322482 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1465285 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1465285 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01P3/06 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
H01P3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/26] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Koaxialleitung mit Zwangskühlung | [2004/41] | English: | Coaxial line with forced cooling | [2004/41] | French: | Ligne coaxiale avec refroidissement forcé | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 07.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3946141 (SCHMIDT FRITZ) [X] 1* column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 53; figure 1 *; | [X]DE10108843 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * |