EP1462415 - Production process of nano carbon material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/10] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Soichiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Katsuhiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sano, Hitomi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Nobuyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007239.9 | 25.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030086005 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003086005 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462415 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462415 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462415 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/02, C01B31/06 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H02H3/22 (KR);
C01B32/154 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
C01B32/162 (EP);
C01B32/26 (EP,US);
H01C7/12 (KR);
H02H3/08 (KR);
C01B2202/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Nanokohlenstoffmaterials | [2004/40] | English: | Production process of nano carbon material | [2004/40] | French: | Procédé de production de matériau en carbone de taille nanométrique | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.2009 | BE | 04.03.2009 | CY | 04.03.2009 | CZ | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | EE | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | IT | 04.03.2009 | NL | 04.03.2009 | PL | 04.03.2009 | RO | 04.03.2009 | SI | 04.03.2009 | SK | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | IE | 25.03.2009 | LU | 25.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | ES | 15.06.2009 | PT | 19.08.2009 | HU | 05.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LU | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
HU | 05.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LU | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 04.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02079082 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [PA]EP1300364 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1300363 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1-14; | [PA]WO2004007361 (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al) [PA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1440932 (CANON KK [JP]) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * |