EP1465207 - Reactor core cooling structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President of TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-12-1, Ookayama, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states President of Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yasuyoshi, Tokyo Institute of Technology Research Lab. for Nuclear Reactors 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 02 /
Muto, Yasushi, Tokyo Institute of Technology Research Lab. for Nuclear Reactors 2-12-1 Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2004/41] | Application number, filing date | 04007270.4 | 25.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | JP20030086719 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003086719 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465207 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Classification | IPC: | G21C15/253 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
G21C15/253 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reaktorkern Kühlstruktur | [2004/41] | English: | Reactor core cooling structure | [2004/41] | French: | Structure de refroidissement pour coeur de réacteur | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |