EP1582695 - Turbomachine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parvizinia, Manuchehr, Dr. Lierberg 38 45478 Mülheim / DE | 02 /
Stüer, Heinrich, Dr. Ringstrasse 28 45721 Haltern / DE | 03 /
Truckenmüller, Frank Riemelsbeck 80 45470 Mülheim / DE | [2005/40] | Application number, filing date | 04007439.5 | 26.03.2004 | [2005/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582695 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D9/02, F01D5/20 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
F01D5/141 (EP);
F05D2250/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaufel für eine Strömungsmaschine | [2005/40] | English: | Turbomachine blade | [2005/40] | French: | Aube de turbomachine | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/05] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.05.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0932501 ; | [X]JPH10331791 ; | [X]FR1536561 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,6 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]FR2053049 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1,6* figures 6,7 *; | [X]CH533466 (MO ENERGETICHESKIJ INSTITUT [RU]) [X] 1-6 * figures 4A,4B *; | [X]US4741667 (PRICE FRANCIS R [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * figure 4 *; | [X]US5480285 (PATEL ASHOK T [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 4,5; table 1 *; | [X]EP0957236 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] - [0010] - [0017] , [0018]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1111188 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1225303 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0062] , [0068]; figure 13 *; | [X]EP1277966 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 2,3,6,7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09032501 A 19970204 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10331791 A 19981215 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract * |