|
28.05.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.09.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
27.11.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.10.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.08.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.04.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2005 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
9 |