EP1465339 - Method for setting an RF channel in a video cassette recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Young Nam c/o Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Jacoby, Georg, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Jacoby, Georg, et al Samson & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007677.0 | 30.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | KR20030019987 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003019987 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465339 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1465339 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03J1/00, H04N5/775 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
H03J1/0008 (EP,US);
G11B31/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | H03J1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/37] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einstellen von Radiofrequenzkanalen in einem Videokassettenrecorder | [2004/41] | English: | Method for setting an RF channel in a video cassette recorder | [2004/41] | French: | Méthode pour établir des canaux RF dans un enregistreur à cassettes vidéo | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 23.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1062803 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0023] ** figures 1,2 * |