EP1468947 - Handling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gämmerler AG Leitenstrasse 26 82538 Geretsried-Gelting / DE | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gämmerler, Gunter Auf der Bleicken 24 82538 Gelting / DE | 02 /
Meisel, Ronald Bayerlandstrasse 3 82431 Kochel am See / DE | 03 /
Kunz, Peter Isardamm 59 82538 Geretsried / DE | 04 /
Schubart, Ralf Peter Mittenwalderstrasse 11 82431 Kochel am See / DE | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007708.3 | 30.03.2004 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | DE20031017948 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10317948 | [2004/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468947 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/30 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
B65H29/66 (EP,US);
B65B27/08 (EP);
B65H31/3054 (EP,US);
B65H2301/42112 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4223 (EP,US);
B65H2402/351 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1932 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] |
Former [2005/28] | |||
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Handhabungssystem | [2004/43] | English: | Handling system | [2004/43] | French: | Système de manipulation | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.06.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | 06.06.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.06.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   28.06.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19504686 (GAEMMERLER HAGEN [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,9 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-5 * [A] 2; | [AD]DE19800162 (GAEMMERLER AG [DE]) [AD] 1,9* the whole document *; | [A]DE10121184 (GAEMMERLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |