EP1464823 - Turbo-charged engine with EGR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/25] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states ISUZU MOTORS LIMITED 26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagisawa, Naoki Isuzu Advanced Engineer. Cent. Ltd 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Tokumaru, Takeshi Isuzu Advanced Engineer. Cent. Ltd 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Kurihara; Hirokazu Isuzu Advanced Engineer. Cent. Ltd 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008072.3 | 02.04.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | JP20030100521 | 03.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003100521 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464823 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464823 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07, F02B37/00, F02B37/013 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F02B29/0412 (EP,US);
F02B37/004 (EP,US);
F02B37/013 (EP,US);
F02B37/025 (EP,US);
F02B37/18 (EP,US);
F02M26/08 (EP,US);
F02M26/10 (EP,US);
F02M26/23 (EP,US);
F02M26/24 (EP,US);
F01N13/107 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
F02M26/25 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/26] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Turbogeladene Brennkraftmaschine mit Abgasrückführung | [2004/41] | English: | Turbo-charged engine with EGR | [2004/41] | French: | Moteur turbocompressé avec recirculation des gaz d'échappement | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4669442 (NAKAMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 36; figure 1 *; | [XY]US6009709 (BAILEY BRETT M [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 62; figure 1 * * column 6, line 25 - line 43 * [Y] 3,4,7; | [Y]EP1213467 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6484500 (COLEMAN GERALD N [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002174654 (YANG ZHOU [US]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0091] , [0097] , [0101] - [0107] *; | [PX]DE10154151 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * paragraphs [0003] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 1 * |