EP1471182 - Construction built along a road for noise and fumes reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wieser-Linhart, Emil Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Dossenweg 49 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieser-Linhart, Emil Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Dossenweg 49 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/48] |
Former [2004/44] | VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Penzinger Strasse 76 1141 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04008124.2 | 02.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | AT20030000633 | 25.04.2003 Original published format: AT 6332003 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471182 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1471182 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E01C1/00, E01F8/00, B08B15/00 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
E01F8/0047 (EP);
B08B15/02 (EP);
E01C1/005 (EP);
F24F8/99 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/07] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Reduzierung der Lärm- und Schadstoffbelastung entlang eines Verkehrsweges | [2004/44] | English: | Construction built along a road for noise and fumes reduction | [2004/44] | French: | Construction le long de routes pour réduire le bruit et la pollution de l'air | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/20] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8912236U (MERO-RAUMSTRUKTUR GMBH & CO WUERZBURG, 8700 WUERZBURG, DE) [Y] 6-8 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE29915671U (KIRCHER HANS PETER [AT]) [Y] 3-5,16,19,21-23 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 19 * * figures 1-4 *; | [XY]DE19859233 (LUTZKAT URSULA [DE]) [X] 1,9-11,15,17,20,24 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,12-14,16,18,19,21-23,25-30; | [DY]US2002009793 (WIESER-LINHART EMIL A J [AT]) [DY] 2,12-14,18,25-30* the whole document * |