EP1466519 - Rotorballer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welger Maschinenfabrik GmbH Gebrüder-Welger-Strasse 3 D-38304 Wolfenbüttel / DE | [2006/28] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Welger Maschinenfabrik GmbH Gebrüder-Welger-Strasse 3 D-38304 Wolfenbüttel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röhrbein, Jürgen Fürstenauer Strasse 19 38159 Wahle / DE | 02 /
Rodewald, Peter Schulstrasse 5 38321 Neindorf / DE | [2004/42] | Application number, filing date | 04008165.5 | 03.04.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | DE2003115919 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10315919 | DE2003115918 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10315918 | [2004/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466519 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466519 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/08 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
A01F15/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Title | German: | Rundballenpresse | [2004/42] | English: | Rotorballer | [2004/42] | French: | Presse à balles rondes | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.07.2006 | CZ | 12.07.2006 | EE | 12.07.2006 | FI | 12.07.2006 | IE | 12.07.2006 | IT | 12.07.2006 | NL | 12.07.2006 | PL | 12.07.2006 | RO | 12.07.2006 | SI | 12.07.2006 | SK | 12.07.2006 | TR | 12.07.2006 | BG | 12.10.2006 | DK | 12.10.2006 | SE | 12.10.2006 | GR | 13.10.2006 | ES | 23.10.2006 | PT | 12.12.2006 | HU | 13.01.2007 | AT | 03.04.2007 | LU | 03.04.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 12.07.2006 | |
CZ | 12.07.2006 | ||
EE | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
AT | 03.04.2007 | ||
LU | 03.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
EE | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
AT | 03.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IE | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
DK | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
NL | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
ES | 23.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 12.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1510885 (DUNLAP SAMUEL H) [A] 8 * page 2, column 1, line 26 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [YD]DE8428625U (CLAAS OHG) [YD] 12 * page 6, line 1 - line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4638623 (SCHAIBLE SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 19,20* column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 7; figures 2-5 *; | [XDY]EP0498576 (VERMEER MFG CO [US]) [XD] 1,3-5,9-11,13-20 * page 3, line 17 - line 54; figures 1-3,5,6 * [Y] 12; | [A]DE29912884U (LELY WELGER MASCHINENFABRIK GM [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 15 - line 21; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE8428625U | DE3409713 | EP0498576 |