EP1471600 - Method of generating multiple SAR transmit beams and a SAR antenna system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium GmbH 81663 München / DE | [2008/46] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states EADS Astrium GmbH 81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heer, Christoph Sternbergweg 5 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
Grafmüller, Bernhard Doebelestrasse 5a 88677 Markdorf / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Ulrich, Thomas Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Ulrich, Thomas EADS Deutschland GmbH, LG-PM - Patente 81663 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Ulrich, Thomas c/o EADS Deutschland GmbH, Patentabteilung 81663 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008173.9 | 03.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | DE2003119063 | 25.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10319063 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471600 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471600 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/24, H01Q25/00, G01S13/90 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
H01Q25/007 (EP,US);
G01S13/904 (EP,US);
H01Q3/2658 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von mehreren SAR-Sendestrahlen und SAR-Antennensystem | [2004/44] | English: | Method of generating multiple SAR transmit beams and a SAR antenna system | [2004/44] | French: | Procéde de génération de multi-faisceaux de transmission de système SAR et système d'antenna de SAR | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.12.2008 | CZ | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IE | 10.12.2008 | PL | 10.12.2008 | RO | 10.12.2008 | SI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | AT | 03.04.2009 | LU | 03.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | HU | 11.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
LU | 03.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
HU | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
LU | 03.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
AT | 03.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 10.12.2008 | |
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
RO | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
IE | 10.12.2008 | ||
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
PL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SI | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02287181 ; | [X]US3965475 (DEERKOSKI LEONARD F, et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,10-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 21 *; | [X]DE2729110 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-3,7-9 * figures 2,3 * * page 3, lines 4-12 * * page 5, lines 15-31 *; | [A]US5926125 (WOOD PETER JOHN [CA]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 9 *; | [X]EP1065518 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0009] , [0014] - [0016] - [0020] - [0028] * * abstract *; | [AD]US6175326 (KARE JORDIN T [US]) [AD] 1-12 * column 3, lines 3-33 * * column 4, lines 5-32 ** claims 1,2,8,14 *; | [X]WO0195427 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,12 * abstract * * page 11, line 20 - page 14, line 11 *; | [X]US6504517 (LIU SHANG-CHIEH [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12 * figures 4-7 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 6 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 6 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910213), vol. 0150, no. 59, Database accession no. (P - 1165), & JP2287181 A 19901127 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * |