EP1473535 - Heat exchanger with sealing body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andritter, Dirk Karl-Braun-Strasse 38 74397 Ingersheim / DE | 02 /
Schuller, Monika Frundsbergstrasse 6 80634 München / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2004/45] | 01 /
Andritter, Dirk Karl-Braun-Strasse 38 74397 Ingersheim / DE | ||
02 /
Schuller, Monika Miguel Angel 48-50, 2.1 08028 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 04008325.5 | 06.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | DE2003119461 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10319461 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1473535 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1473535 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/00, B60K11/04 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B60K11/04 (EP);
F28F9/002 (EP);
F28F2230/00 (EP);
F28F2255/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/45] | F28F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher mit Dichtkörper | [2004/45] | English: | Heat exchanger with sealing body | [2004/45] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur avec corps d'étanchéité | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4137038 (THERMAL-WERKE, WAERME-, KAELTE-, KLIMATECHNIK GMBH, 6832 HOCKENHEIM, D) [A] 1 * figures 2a,3 *; | [A]DE19524668 (THERMAL WERKE BETEILIGUNGEN GM [DE]) [A] 3* figure 3c *; | [A]US5915490 (WUERFEL MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 8; figure 4 *; | [X]US2003051497 (NOMURA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,13-15 * page 2, paragraph 33; figures 4b,7 *; | [PX]FR2838080 (PEGUFORM FRANCE [FR]) [PX] 1,3,4,8,9,12-15 * page 6, line 1 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, line 4 - page 7, line 6 * * page 9, line 1 - page 9, line 5 * * figures 5,10-13,16 * |