EP1434080 - Spectacle lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gotoh, Kiyohito, c/o Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
Ichioka, Hiromi, c/o Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04008339.6 | 20.04.1999 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | JP19980111884 | 22.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11188498 | JP19980111885 | 22.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11188598 | JP19980111886 | 22.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11188698 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1434080 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1434080 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02, G02B3/00, B29D11/00, B29C45/70 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
B29C45/561 (EP,US);
B29C2045/5615 (EP,US);
B29C2045/5635 (EP,US);
B29C2045/567 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76006 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76187 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/27] | Title | German: | Opthalmische Linse | [2004/27] | English: | Spectacle lens | [2004/27] | French: | Lentille opthalmique | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 19.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99913725.0 / EP1106326 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4540534 (GRENDOL CLARK L [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 15 * * column 2, line 32 - column 2, line 56 * * column 5, line 7 - column 5, line 13 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 25 * * figure -; claims 1,6 *; | [A]US4854708 (KAFRI ODED [IL], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 16 - column 1, line 68 ** column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 68 *; | [A]EP0375152 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 29 - page 1, line 44 * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 13 *; | [X]US5694217 (HIZUKA MASATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 62 * |