EP1467128 - Multistage automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | ||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2 Tachara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katakura, Takeji C206, 3-4-48, Nishionuma Sagamahara-shi Kanagawa 229-0012 / JP | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008609.2 | 08.04.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | JP20030105400 | 09.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003105400 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467128 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467128 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/04 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
F16H61/688 (EP,US);
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0604 (EP,US);
B60W2710/027 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0052 (EP,US);
F16H2306/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrstufiges Automatikgetriebe | [2004/42] | English: | Multistage automatic transmission | [2004/42] | French: | Transmission automatique à plusieurs étages | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2002357267 ; | [A]US4662496 (SAKAKIYAMA RYUZO [JP]) [A] 1,8,9* column 3, line 42 - line 58 *; | [A]US5046174 (LENTZ CARL A [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9 * figures 3a,3b,4,10 *; | [A]US5603672 (ZHANG HONG [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 9, line 33 - line 40 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0805292 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 6, line 14 - line 23 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 10 * * figure 12 *; | [A]DE10048239 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 2, line 56 - line 62 * * column 4, line 22 - line 32 * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]US2003027686 (SHIBATA NOBORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * figure 7 *; | [PX]US2004009843 (HABECK DIRK [DE]) [PX] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * figure 1 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030402), vol. 2003, no. 04, & JP2002357267 A 20021213 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1,8,9 * abstract * |