EP1467430 - High frequency transmission line and high frequency board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimoda, Hideaki TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008777.7 | 13.04.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | JP20030107523 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003107523 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467430 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/08 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
H05K1/0251 (EP,US);
H01P5/08 (EP,US);
H05K1/0219 (EP,US);
H05K1/0222 (EP,US);
H05K1/115 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09618 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochfrequenz-Übertragungsleitung und Hochfrequenzplatte | [2004/42] | English: | High frequency transmission line and high frequency board | [2004/42] | French: | Ligne de transmission à haute fréquence et carte à haute fréquence | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 14.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 27.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000068716 ; | [X]FR2625373 (THOMSON HYBRIDES MICROONDES [FR]) [X] 5,14 * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 7; figure 5 *; | [X]EP0358497 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [X] 1,12* figures 6,8 *; | [XA] - KIM J ET AL, "Novel microstrip-to-stripline transitions for leakage suppression in multilayer microwave circuits", ELECTRICAL PERFORMANCE OF ELECTRONIC PACKAGING, 1998. IEEE 7TH TOPICAL MEETING ON WEST POINT, NY, USA 26-28 OCT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19981026), ISBN 0-7803-4965-2, pages 252 - 255, XP010313751 [X] 1,12 * figures 1,2 * [A] 11,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EPEP.1998.734036 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000068716 A 20000303 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,12 * abstract * |