EP1452632 - Four-for one twister [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [2009/06] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagao, Isao 948-9 Ikeda Onmachi Omihachiman-shi Shiga / JP | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Vogeser, Werner, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Vogeser, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008829.6 | 18.12.1997 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | JP19970038962 | 24.02.1997 Original published format: JP 3896297 | JP19970040719 | 25.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4071997 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1452632 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1452632 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1452632 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D01H7/88 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
D01H7/868 (EP);
D01H1/105 (EP);
D01H7/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2004/36] | Title | German: | Vierfach-Zwirnmaschine | [2004/36] | English: | Four-for one twister | [2004/36] | French: | Broche quadruple torsion | [2004/36] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97122447.2 / EP0863234 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07268732 ; | [A]JPH07268731 ; | [A]US4222221 (LENORAK FERDINAND) [A] 5,8* the whole document *; | [X]EP0611841 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 24 - line 26 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07268732 A 19951017 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 5,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07268731 A 19951017 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 5,8 * abstract * |