EP1550617 - Non-plastic container for storing food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lock & Lock Co., Ltd. 386 Gasan-li Seonjang-myun Asan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Hana Cobi Co., Ltd. 1556-1, Seocho-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Hana Cobi Co., Ltd. 1556-1, Seocho-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Hana Cobi Co., Ltd. 4L-83B, Namdong Ind. Complex, Kojan-dong Namdong-ku, Incheon / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Chang-Ho Hana Cobi Building, 1556-1 Seocho3-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008909.6 | 14.04.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | KR20030101045 | 30.12.2003 Original published format: KR 2003101045 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550617 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1550617 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D45/20, B65D1/40 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
B65D45/20 (EP,US);
B65D43/02 (KR);
B65D1/40 (EP,US);
B65D43/0218 (EP,US);
B65D2543/0012 (EP,US);
B65D2543/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | Lebensmittelbehälter aus einem anderen Material als Plastik | [2005/27] | English: | Non-plastic container for storing food | [2005/27] | French: | Conteneur pour denrées alimentaires n'étant pas en plastique | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CH | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | LI | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | PL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 13.06.2007 | |
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4880138 (PFEIFFER PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 50 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]DE19513375 (LEIFHEIT AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract * [A] 1,2,4,5; | [YA]US5785198 (CREDLE JR WILLIAM S [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 44; figures 1-5 * [A] 5; | [A]EP1172304 (HANA COBI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [YA]CA2314537 (PROMOTIONS ATLANTIQUES INC [CA]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, line 4 - line 26; figures 1-4 * [A] 5 |