EP1553190 - Mutations in and genomic structure of HERG - a long QT syndrome gene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states The University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states The University of Utah Research Foundation Suite 110, 615 Arapeen Drive Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keating, Mark T. 1 Mason Street Brookline, MA 02446-4006 / US | 02 /
Splawski, Igor Apartm. 140, 900 East 3991 South, Apt. 40 Salt Lake City, UT 84124 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr., et al Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008958.3 | 20.07.1999 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | US19980122847 | 27.07.1998 Original published format: US 122847 | US19990226012 | 06.01.1999 Original published format: US 226012 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1553190 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1553190 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C07H21/04 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mutationen und genomische Struktur des Herg-Gens - ein Gen des Long-QT-Syndroms | [2006/03] | English: | Mutations in and genomic structure of HERG - a long QT syndrome gene | [2005/28] | French: | Mutations du gene herg du syndrome de QT long et sa structure genomique | [2006/03] |
Former [2005/28] | Mutationen und genomische Struktur des HERG-Gens - ein Gen des Long-QT-Syndroms | ||
Former [2005/28] | Mutations du gène HERG du syndrome de QT long et sa structure génomique | Examination procedure | 18.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99935710.6 / EP1102863 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.01.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5599673 (KEATING MARK T [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document, in particular "Example 7"; paragraph bridging columns 7 and 8; SEQ ID NOs: 22, 24 and 29 *; | [X] - SPLAWSKI I ET AL, "Genomic Structure of Three Long QT Syndrome Genes:KVLQT1, HERG,andKCNE1", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (19980701), vol. 51, no. 1, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 86 - 97, XP004449405 [X] 1-3 * the whole document, in particular Table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1998.5361 | [A] - ACKERMAN M J, "THE LONG QT SYNDROME: ION CHANNEL DISEASES OF THE HEART", MAYO CLINIC PROCEEDINGS, MAYO MEDICAL VENTURES, ROCHESTER, MN, US, (199803), vol. 73, no. 3, ISSN 0025-6196, pages 250 - 269, XP001005941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4065/73.3.250 |