EP1438928 - A delivery system for a tooth whitener using a strip of material having low flexural stiffness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sagel, Paul Albert 4851 Gallup Run Mason Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
Dirksing, Robert Stanley 7188 Wyandotte Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45233 / US | 03 /
Rohman, Frederick James 11452 Enyart Road Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane, Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | ||
Former [2004/30] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04008963.3 | 02.06.1998 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | US19970870330 | 06.06.1997 Original published format: US 870330 | US19980040000 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: US 40000 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438928 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1438928 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/06, A61K6/00, A61K9/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
A61C19/063 (EP,US);
A61C19/06 (KR);
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61C19/066 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L23/06 (EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/08 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L71/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2004/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verabreichung von Zahnbleicher unter Verwendung eines Streifens mit geringer Biegesteifigkeit | [2004/30] | English: | A delivery system for a tooth whitener using a strip of material having low flexural stiffness | [2004/30] | French: | Dispositif d'administration d'un agent blanchissant pour les dents au moyen d'une bande de matière dotée faible resistant à la flexion | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98926150.8 / EP1011516 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | [2008/28] |
Former [2008/26] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 01.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0250187 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROD INC [US]) [Y] 7-9 * page 4, line 8 - line 38 * * examples 2-4,6,7 * * claim - *; | [A]US4900552 (SANVORDEKER DILIP R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 20 - line 32 * * table III ** claim - *; | [A]US5409631 (FISCHER DAN E [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 68 - column 7, line 2; claim - *; | [XY]WO9711676 (MONTGOMERY ROBERT ERIC [US]) [X] 1-6 * example 2 * * claim - * [Y] 7-9; | [A]US5631000 (PELLICO MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * example - * * claim - * | Examination | - Dow product sheet describing Polyox resins | by applicant | US2835628 | US4713243 | US5310563 | US5425953 | US5575654 |