EP1477596 - Method of cutting yarn during doffing in spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yakushi, Makoto Kabushiki Kaisa Toyota Jid. 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Niimi, Kiwamu Kabushiki Kaisa Toyota Jid. 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Naoki Kabushiki Kaisa Toyota Jid. 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009105.0 | 16.04.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | JP20030134871 | 13.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003134871 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477596 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477596 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477596 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D01H9/16 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
D01H1/38 (EP);
D01H9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2006/28] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Durchschneiden von Fäden beim Abziehen von Spulen an einer Spinnmaschine | [2004/47] | English: | Method of cutting yarn during doffing in spinning machine | [2004/47] | French: | Méthode pour couper des fils pendant l'enlèvement dans un métier à filer | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/08] | CH | 30.04.2009 | |
LI | 30.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3967440 (NARUMI AKIO, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0278561 (SAVIO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-6* column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19537687 (SPINDELFABRIK HARTHA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1213381 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [DA] 1-6 * column 8, line 38 - column 9, line 42; figures 1-9 * |