EP1477595 - Method of operating ring spinning machine during suspension for doffing and method of cutting yarn during doffing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yakushi, Makoto c/o Kabushiki K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Niimi, Kiwamu c/o Kabushiki K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009107.6 | 16.04.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | JP20030137292 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003137292 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477595 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477595 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D01H9/04, D01H9/16 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
D01H5/32 (EP);
D01H9/04 (EP);
D01H9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/28] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Ringspinnmaschine sowie Verfahren zum Schneiden des Fadens beim Auswechseln von Spulen | [2004/47] | English: | Method of operating ring spinning machine during suspension for doffing and method of cutting yarn during doffing | [2004/47] | French: | Procédé pour actionner un métier à filer à anneaux et procédé pour couper le fil lors du changement de bobines | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.06.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0949127 ; | [A]EP0528752 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1-8* column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10037513 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 2 * * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09049127 A 19970218 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * |