EP1471498 - Sound Pick-up Device, Sound Instrument and Method for Picking-up Sound Vibrations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/44] | Sound pick-up device, sound instrument and method for picking-up sound vibrations | ||
[2004/46] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller, Hermann Waldgut Ettental 66386 St. Ingbert / DE | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Hermann Waldgut Ettental 66386 St. Ingbert / DE | 02 /
Lauer, Martin Ketteler Strasse 18 66606 St. Wendel / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Jackermeier, Siegfried, et al Lorenz . Seidler . Gossel Widenmayerstr. 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Jackermeier, Siegfried, Dr., et al Lorenz . Seidler . Gossel Widenmayerstr. 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009134.0 | 16.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | DE2003118216 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10318216 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471498 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1471498 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/32, G10H3/14, G10L15/00 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
G10H3/185 (EP);
G10H1/32 (EP);
G10H2220/465 (EP);
G10H2220/525 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Schallschwingungsabnahmesystem, Klanginstrument und Verfahren zur Abnahme von Schallschwingungen | [2004/44] | English: | Sound Pick-up Device, Sound Instrument and Method for Picking-up Sound Vibrations | [2004/46] | French: | Dispositif de prise de son, instrument sonore et méthode de prise de son. | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/44] | Sound pick-up device, sound instrument and method for picking-up sound vibrations | ||
Former [2004/44] | Dispositif de prise de son, instrument sonore et méthode de prise de son | Examination procedure | 14.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/52] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2978945 (RUDOLPH DOPERA, et al) [A] 1,4-6,11,12,19-26 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 32 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US4211139 (MURAKAMI KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,5,11,12,19-21,23-26 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - line 60 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 49 * * figures 6-13 *; | [A]US4867027 (BARBERA RICHARD [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,11,19-26 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - line 37 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 7 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5461193 (SCHERTLER STEPHAN [CH]) [A] 1,2,12,20-26 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [X]EP1258863 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,19-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 1-3,9,11,13B-13C *; | [T] - DIDGERIDOO-HAMBURG.DE, "WOOD DATA", URL: http://www.didgeridoo-hamburg.de/E/CADSD/wood-data/wood-data.htm, (20041124), XP002307463 [T] 3 * tables 1-5 * |