EP1470892 - Polishing pad and method of polishing a semiconductor wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoi, Hiromi c/o JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 02 /
Shiho, Hiroshi c/o JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 03 /
Hasegawa, Kou c/o JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | 04 /
Kawahashi, Nobuo c/o JSR Corporation 6-10, Tsukiji 5-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009441.9 | 21.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | JP20030117538 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003117538 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470892 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24D7/12 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
B24B37/205 (EP,US);
A61J11/007 (KR);
A61J11/0035 (KR);
A61J11/006 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/29] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schleifkissen und Verfahren zum Polieren einer Halbleiterplatte | [2004/44] | English: | Polishing pad and method of polishing a semiconductor wafer | [2004/44] | French: | Tampon de polissage et procédé de polissage d'une plaquette de semi-conductrice | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 14.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5893796 (BIRANG MANOOCHER [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, line 6 - column 22, line 18; figures 3A,3D,3F *; | [A]EP0941806 (LAM RES CORP [US]); | [Y]US2002144771 (KUCZYNSKI JOSEPH PAUL [US]) [Y] 1,2,7-12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0048]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1252973 (JSR CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-6 * the whole document * |