EP1484507 - Process for manufacturing a stator for vacuum pump and stator obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARIAN S.p.A. Via Varian 54 10040 Leini' (Torino) / IT | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casaro, Fausto Corso Racconigi No. 101 10141 Torino / IT | 02 /
Del Missier, Cinzia Via Piazzi No. 15 10129 Torino / IT | 03 /
Gotta, Romina Silvia Via Gorizia No. 16 10080 Bosconero (Torino) / IT | 04 /
Maccarrone, Cristian Via Giosué Borsi No. 81 10149 Torino / IT | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2004/50] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al INTERPATENT S.R.L., Via Caboto No.35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04009518.4 | 22.04.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | IT2003TO00420 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: IT TO20030420 | [2004/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484507 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484507 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04D19/04 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
F04D19/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/35] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Stators für eine Vakuumpumpe und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellten Stator | [2004/50] | English: | Process for manufacturing a stator for vacuum pump and stator obtained thereby | [2004/50] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un rotor de pompe à vide et rotor ainsi obtenu | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 04.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.07.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/42] | IT | 19.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2218615 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1,8,20-22 * the whole document *; | [X]US6454525 (BLECKER ARMIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,20-22 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1249612 (VARIAN SPA [IT]) [A] 1* the whole document * |