EP1471317 - Composite valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikoki Corporation 17-24 Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0082 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Fujikoki Corporation 17-24 Todoroki 7-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0082 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Kazuhiko Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0082 / JP | 02 /
Ezaki, Hiroyuki Fujikoki Corporation 17-24, Todoroki 7-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0082 / JP | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009521.8 | 22.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | JP20030119863 | 24.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003119863 | JP20030305871 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003305871 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471317 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1471317 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/04, F25B41/06, F16K31/42 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
F16K31/423 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/20 (EP,KR,US);
F16K11/161 (EP,KR,US);
F16K31/0624 (EP,KR,US);
F16K31/408 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/30 (EP,KR,US);
F25B47/022 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2400/0403 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2600/2505 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2013/07] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammengesetztes Ventil | [2004/44] | English: | Composite valve | [2004/44] | French: | Soupape composite | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3449923 (HANSEN CHARLES C, et al) [I] 1-13 * figures 1, 6 *; | [A]EP0894651 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0176] *; | [ID]JP2001124440 (TAIHEIYO KOGYO KK) [ID] 1-13 * abstract *; | [I]US6367506 (TAKAGI NOBORU [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract *; | [I]JP2002120547 (DENSO CORP, et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract *; | [XP]JP2004028488 (DENSO CORP) [XP] 1,3,6* abstract * | by applicant | JP2001124440 | JP2002115937 |