EP1439290 - Combustion engine with EGR apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuma, Takao c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi / JP | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009690.1 | 04.11.1997 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | JP19960303149 | 14.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30314996 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1439290 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1439290 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D21/08, F02D41/14, F02D43/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
F02D41/144 (EP,US);
F02D41/0072 (EP,US);
F02M26/46 (EP,US);
F02M26/49 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/30] | F02D21/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/30] | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine mit Abgasrückführeinrichtung | [2004/30] | English: | Combustion engine with EGR apparatus | [2004/30] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne avec système de recirculation de gaz d' échappement | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97119282.8 / EP0843084 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970119282) is 16.08.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4794903 (SUZUKI HIROYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 59 * * figure 3B *; | [A]EP0351960 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 40 - line 48 ** column 3, line 15 - line 21 *; | [A]US5201303 (KOJIMA SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 49 - line 57 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 19 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 26 * * column 9, line 7 - line 26 * * figures 4,7,8,16 *; | [A] - M. NISHIDA ET AL, "Closed Loop Control of the EGR Rate Using the Oxygen Sensor", SAE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION, (19880229), no. 880133, pages 6.168 - 6.170, XP002105012 [A] 1-6 * page 6.171, column 2, line 52 - page 6.172, column 2, line 8 * * page 6.173, column 2, line 12 - line 26 * * figure 10 * | by applicant | US4794903 | EP0351960 | US5201303 |